Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03431
Date Filed2019-11-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the agency's February 2019 decision to reduce the grazing fee, which applies in 16 Western states. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told PEER that its request would be placed on the complex track for processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-141COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6562499) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Declaration 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure, # 3 Summons Attorney General Summons, # 4 Summons Agency Summons, # 5 Summons USAO summons)(Jenkins, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/20/2019) (zmc). (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (zmc) Modified on 11/19/2019 (zmc). (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-15Case assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmc) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar