Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFLIPPIN v. US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03546
Date Filed2019-11-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffAMEER FLIPPIN
DefendantUS DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantKEVIN KREBS Assistant Director, In an Official Capacity
DefendantKEVIN KREBS Assistant Director, In an Official Capacity
TERMINATED: 01/10/2020
DefendantKEVIN KREBS Assistant Director, In a Personal and Individual Capacity
TERMINATED: 01/10/2020
DefendantKEVIN KREBS Assistant Director, In a Personal and Individual Capacity
DefendantFLORENCE Y. PAN Judiciary, In an Official Capacity
TERMINATED: 01/10/2020
DefendantFLORENCE Y. PAN Judiciary, In an Official Capacity
DefendantFLORENCE Y. PAN In a Personal and Individual Capacity
TERMINATED: 01/10/2020
DefendantFLORENCE Y. PAN In a Personal and Individual Capacity
DefendantJOHN DOES 1-100
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-25Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/25/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-251COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-100, KEVIN KREBS(Assistant Director, In a Personal and Individual Capacity ), KEVIN KREBS(Assistant Director, In an Official Capacity ), FLORENCE Y. PAN(In a Personal and Individual Capacity ), FLORENCE Y. PAN(Judiciary, In an Official Capacity ), US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE with Jury Demand filed by AMEER FLIPPIN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-252MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by AMEER FLIPPIN (adh, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-253MOTION to Issue Summons by AMEER FLIPPIN (adh, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-254MOTION for Order to Appoint Marshal For Service Of Process by AMEER FLIPPIN (adh, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-275CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AMEER FLIPPIN. (Attachment: # 1 Supplement)(zsb) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2019-12-186MOTION to Dismiss by FLORENCE Y. PAN(In a Personal and Individual Capacity ) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeBerardinis, Robert) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2020-01-107MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 6 Motion to Dismiss as moot. (see order for details) Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/8/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-01-10Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-01-108SUMMONS (3) Issued as to US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (adh, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-01-109RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/10/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/10/2020. (eg) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-1410RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/13/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/12/2020. (jf) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-02-1111Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by KEVIN KREBS(Assistant Director, In a Personal and Individual Capacity ), KEVIN KREBS(Assistant Director, In an Official Capacity ), US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-03-02MINUTE ORDER granting 11 the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension to March 27, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 3/2/20.(ah) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 3/27/2020. (tg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-16MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 3 the plaintiff's motion to issue summons; and 4 the plaintiff's motion to appoint the U.S. Marshal as process server. The government has been served with process and has appeared in the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 3/16/20.(ah) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-2512MOTION to Dismiss , or In the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Declaration, # 7 Text of Proposed Order, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Jackson, Michelle). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 3/27/2020 (zrdj). (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-03-2513Order advising the plaintiff to respond by June 1, 2020, to the defendant's dispositive or risk dismissal of the case based on defendant's documented assertions (see document for details). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 3/25/20.(ah) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-03-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to dispositive motion due by 6/1/2020. (tg) (Entered: 03/26/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar