Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMEINDERTSMA v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03580
Date Filed2019-11-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffBEN MEINDERTSMA
Case DescriptionBen Meindertsma, a journalist for the Dutch Broadcast Foundation, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning the investigation of a 2015 air strike in Hawijah, Iraq. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Meindertsma then sent a letter to DOD asking for expedited processing. The agency denied his request for expedited processing. Meindertsma renewed his request for expedited processing, providing new evidence. The agency denied his renewed request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Meindertsma filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-271COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6601116) filed by BEN MEINDERTSMA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2019-12-02Case assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmc) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2019-12-022SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2019-12-263NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Terrell Malone on behalf of BEN MEINDERTSMA (Malone, Sean) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2020-01-034First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 01/03/2020)
2020-01-06MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, Defendant's 4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to 1 Plaintiff's Complaint by January 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/6/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-01-215ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-27MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by February 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/27/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 2/27/2020. (zkh) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-02-136Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 02/13/2020)
2020-02-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by April 17, 2020, and every sixty days thereafter, until the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/14/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-04-177Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-06-168Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-08-219Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 08/21/2020)
2020-10-2010Joint STATUS REPORT by BEN MEINDERTSMA. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by November 5, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/20/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-11-0511Joint STATUS REPORT by BEN MEINDERTSMA. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by December 5, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/6/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-12-0412Joint STATUS REPORT by BEN MEINDERTSMA. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any Motion for Attorney Fees by January 29, 2021; Defendant shall file its opposition by March 5, 2021; and Plaintiff shall file any reply by April 5, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/8/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar