Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFolkman v. U.S. Department of State
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2019cv12440
Date Filed2019-12-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler
PlaintiffTheodore J Folkman
Case DescriptionTheodore Folkman, an attorney, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning provision of benefits to locally-employed staff at any U.S. embassy or consulate injured on the job under the Federal Employees Compensation Act or similar statute in the foreign country. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Folkman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [21]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-021COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of State Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7994922 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Theodore J Folkman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil action cover sheet, # 3 Local category sheet)(Folkman, Theodore) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2019-12-032NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
2019-12-033Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
2019-12-174MOTION to Issue Summons by Theodore J Folkman. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Summons)(Folkman, Theodore) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-185Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 4 Motion for Summons. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-186Summons Reissued as to U.S. Department of State. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2020-01-027NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of U.S. Department of State (Johnson, Anita) (Entered: 01/02/2020)
2020-01-068CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Theodore J Folkman.. (Folkman, Theodore) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-01-109ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2020 02:15 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-01-2410NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Nicole Lindberg on behalf of Theodore J Folkman (Lindberg, Christina) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-2711SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theodore J Folkman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Folkman, Theodore) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-2712SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Theodore J Folkman. U.S. Department of State served on 12/20/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Folkman, Theodore) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-2713Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 2/1/2020 to file Answer and Reset Scheduling Conference by U.S. Department of State.(Johnson, Anita) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-28Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time. The deputy clerk, Harold Putnam, Esq., will set a new date. (Bowler, Marianne) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-2914ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference reset for 2/27/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-02-0315ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. Department of State.(Johnson, Anita) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-2616Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to 3/26/2020 by Theodore J Folkman.(Folkman, Theodore) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-26Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 16 Motion to Continue. (Bowler, Marianne) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-2617ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Scheduling Conference reset for 3/26/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-03-0518ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Scheduling Conference reset for 3/25/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-1319NOTICE of Settlement by Theodore J Folkman (Folkman, Theodore) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-2320ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Noting that this matter has settled, 3/25/2020 Scheduling Conference is cancelled. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-04-3021Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. FINAL JUDGMENT. In light of the parties' settlement (Docket Entry # 19 ), it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this action be DISMISSED with prejudice subject to the right of either party to move within thirty days, for good cause shown, to reopen the case for further proceedings. (Patton, Christine) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar