Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMARTINEZ v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03616
Date Filed2019-12-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffFREDDY MARTINEZ
Case DescriptionFreddy Martinez, a journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning Brian Benezkowski's daily calendar and those of his staff from September 2019 to October 2019. Martinez also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further, Martinez filed an administrative appeal challenging the delay. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Martinez filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-031COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6611945) filed by FREDDY MARTINEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
2019-12-032NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of FREDDY MARTINEZ (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
2019-12-04Case assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmc) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-064STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 6, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2020-01-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/17/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/17/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/22/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-258NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Chang on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Chang, William) (Entered: 01/25/2020)
2020-01-279ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Chang, William) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-02-2810Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chang, William) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-03-02MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the 10 Joint Motion for Leave to File Status Report, Nunc Pro Tunc , and DIRECTING the parties to file a further joint status report on April 30, 2020, and further DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to docket the Joint Status Report, ECF 10-1. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 2, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint status report due by 4/30/2020. (tg) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-0211Joint STATUS REPORT. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-04-2812Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Chang, William) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-04-28MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by July 17, 2020, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed by then. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 28, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-04-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/17/2020. (tg) (Entered: 04/29/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar