Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePIERCE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03622
Date Filed2019-12-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffGEORGE PIERCE
Case DescriptionGeorge Pierce submitted six FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning emails from various officials mentioning his name. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After the agency failed to respond, Pierce filed complaints with the Office of Government Information Services. After hearing nothing from the agency, Pierce filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-041COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6615424) filed by GEORGE PIERCE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Civil Cover Sheet, # 19 Summons)(Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-042NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of GEORGE PIERCE (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-05Case assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-063SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2020-01-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 12/20/2019 (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/20/2019 (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/16/2019. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/16/2020. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-158ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-15MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before January 30, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/15/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/30/2020 (tj) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-309Joint STATUS REPORT by GEORGE PIERCE. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 01/30/2020)
2020-01-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 3, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/31/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/3/2020. (tj) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-03-0310Joint STATUS REPORT by GEORGE PIERCE. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-03MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 13, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/3/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/13/2020 (tj) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar