Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03626
Date Filed2019-12-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning the agency's recent attempts to procure three drugs used in federal executions. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. BOP denied the request entirely, citing a variety of exemptions. CREW filed an administrative appeal of the denial. CREW also submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for the same records requested from BOP. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told CREW it qualified for unusual circumstances. After hearing nothing further from either agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-041COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6616434) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons Department of Justice)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-05Case assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2019-12-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/16/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/16/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/15/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/16/19. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-185NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica A. Lutkenhaus on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Lutkenhaus, Jessica) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2020-01-156ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-16MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before January 30, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 16, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-307Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/30/2020)
2020-01-31MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 27, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 31, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-02-278Joint STATUS REPORT on Behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-27MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 16, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 27, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar