Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTOBIAS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03649
Date Filed2019-12-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJIMMY TOBIAS
Case DescriptionJimmy Tobias, a reporter, submitted 16 FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the title transfer of the Central Valley Project. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Tobias filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY
DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-061COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6626981) filed by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Civil Cover Sheet, # 24 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2019-12-062NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2019-12-09Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-093SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2020-01-154ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule by January 29, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/15/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/29/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 12/16/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY served on 12/16/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/17/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-158RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/16/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-169NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brenda A. Gonzalez on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Damon Taaffe (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-2910Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-30MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 10 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by March 6, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/30/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/30/2020)
2020-01-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-03-0411Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-04MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 11 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by April 20, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/4/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/20/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-04-1712Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-17MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 12 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by June 22, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/17/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/22/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-06-2213Joint STATUS REPORT by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-2214NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Tilghman on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-22MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 13 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by September 22, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/22/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/22/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-09-2215Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-23MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 15 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by December 22, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/23/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/22/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-12-2216Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2020-12-23MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 16 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by March 22, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/23/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/22/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2021-03-2217Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-22MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 17 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by June 21, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/22/2021. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar