Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCHEN v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03652
Date Filed2019-12-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffRAM CHEN
Case DescriptionRam Chen submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning how Bio Medical Advanced Research and Development Authority funded buildings in College Station and Byran, Texas to address the country's preparedness for medical emergencies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Chen contacted the agency a number of times to check on the status of his request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Chen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
200 Independence Avenue, SW
Washington, DC 202021
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-061COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6627463) filed by RAM CHEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2019-12-09Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-092SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-263NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2019-12-264NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Terrell Malone on behalf of RAM CHEN (Malone, Sean) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2020-01-165Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-21MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must file its response to the 1 complaint by February 17, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/21/2020. (lcabj3) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-02-186ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-02-20MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before March 20, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/20/2020. (lcabj3) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before 3/20/2020. (jth) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-03-207Joint STATUS REPORT by RAM CHEN. (Malone, Sean) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-03-23MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 7 joint status report, the parties must submit another status report by May 20, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/23/2020. (lcabj3) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-05-208Joint STATUS REPORT by RAM CHEN. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar