Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER v. UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03687
Date Filed2019-12-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffHUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Human Rights Defense Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning litigation filed against the agency. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and changed the tracking number several times. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, HRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantCUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantUNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-101COMPLAINT against CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6634918) filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2019-12-11Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/11/2019)
2019-12-112SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/11/2019)
2019-12-143STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 14, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 12/14/2019)
2019-12-184NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Lucas Marshall on behalf of HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER (Marshall, Daniel) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-265NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2019-12-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/12/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/11/2020. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2019-12-267RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/12/2019. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2019-12-268RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 12/12/2019 (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2020-01-139ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar