Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBerryhill v. Bonneville Power Administration
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2019cv02001
Date Filed2019-12-10
Date Closed2020-12-23
JudgeMagistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman
PlaintiffDr. Jerome Boyd Berryhill an individual citizen
Case DescriptionJerome Berryhill submitted a FOIA request to the Bonneville Power Administration for records concerning easement work done at his property. The agency disclosed 453 pages with redactions under Exemption 5 (privileges). Berryhill filed an administrative appeal but the agency's initial decision was upheld. He then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBonneville Power Administration A United States agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [25]
Opinion/Order [32]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-101Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6115527 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Jerome Boyd Berryhill against Bonneville Power Administration. (Witte, Ann) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2019-12-102Proposed Summons Filed by Jerome Boyd Berryhill. (Witte, Ann) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2019-12-103Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 4/8/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/8/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/8/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2019-12-104Summons Issued Electronically as to Bonneville Power Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2019-12-105Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint 1 . Filed by Jerome Boyd Berryhill. (Witte, Ann) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2019-12-116Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (eo) (Entered: 12/11/2019)
2020-01-219Answer to 1 Complaint . Filed by Bonneville Power Administration. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-02-2510Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-03-0511Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (jy) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-0512Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Karin J. Immergut to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (eo) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-04-2913SCHEDULING ORDER: At the request of Plaintiff, SETTING a Discovery Hearing and a Rule 16 Conference for Monday, May 4, 2020, at 10:00 AM by telephone. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (phone number to be provided via separate sealed entry) five minutes before the scheduled conference time. The court will join the conference call at the appointed time. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to giselle_williams@ord.uscourts.gov, by noon on May 1, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) (Entered: 04/29/2020)
2020-05-0414MINUTES of Proceedings: Discovery Hearing and Rule 16 Conference held by telephone before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman on 5/4/2020. ORDER denying Plaintiff's request to compel a deposition of Carlos Mora Flores, with leave to renew after Defendant files its motion for summary judgment. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due by 9/4/2020. Plaintiff's response and cross-motion for summary judgment due by 9/25/2020. Defendant's reply in support of summary judgment and response to Plaintiff's cross-motion due by 10/16/2020. Plaintiff's reply in support of summary judgment is due by 11/6/2020. ORDER striking Pretrial Order deadline. The parties are advised that a telephone conference must be scheduled with Judge Beckerman before any discovery motion is filed. Ann B. Witte present as counsel for plaintiff. Kevin C. Danielson present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: Ryan White, (503) 326-8184. Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman presiding. (gw) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-09-0415Motion for Summary Judgment . Filed by Bonneville Power Administration. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-0416Declaration of Candice Palen . Filed by Bonneville Power Administration. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 15 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-2217Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment 15 oral argument requested. Filed by Jerome Boyd Berryhill. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit TABLE, # 2 Exhibit SPREADSHEET) (Witte, Ann) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-2218Brief Declaration of Plaintiff . Filed by Jerome Boyd Berryhill. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition 17 .) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Wife's declaration, # 2 Attachment Witte Declaration) (Witte, Ann) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-10-1619Reply in Support of to Motion for Summary Judgment 15 . Filed by All Defendants. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-1721Final Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment 15 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Jerome Boyd Berryhill. (Witte, Ann) (Entered: 10/17/2020)
2020-10-1721Final Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment 15 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Jerome Boyd Berryhill. (Witte, Ann) (Entered: 10/17/2020)
2020-10-2122ORDER: The Clerk is directed to strike ECF No. 20 , as it was mistakenly filed by Plaintiff as a duplicate of ECF No. 19 , Defendant's Reply in Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered on 10/21/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-11-2023SCHEDULING ORDER: At the request of Plaintiff, SETTING a Discovery Hearing regarding documents submitted for in camera review, for Wednesday, December 2, 2020, at 09:30 AM in Portland by telephone before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. Conference call information to follow by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-12-0224MINUTES of Proceedings: Discovery Hearing held by telephone before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman on 12/2/2020. Ann B. Witte present as counsel for plaintiff. Kevin C. Danielson present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: Ryan White, (503) 326-8184. Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman presiding. (gw) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-2325OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated, the Court GRANTS BPA's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 15 ). DATED this 23rd day of December, 2020, by United States Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (pjg) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-2326JUDGMENT: Based on the Court's OPINION AND ORDER, IT IS ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. DATED this 23rd day of December, 2020, by United States Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (pjg) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar