Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleState of New York v. The U.S. Department of the Interior et al
DistrictNorthern District of New York
CitySyracuse Albany
Case Number1:2019cv01551
Date Filed2019-12-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge David N. Hurd
PlaintiffState of New York
Case DescriptionThe State of New York submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning the agency's implementation of E.O. 13,771 on regulatory reform, particularly communications with OMB. The State also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The State of New York sent a second FOIA request to OMB for records concerning communications between the agency and the Department of Interior, Department of Energy, and the EPA pertaining to implementation of E.O. 13,771. The State also requested a fee waiver. OMB acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from either agency, the State of New York filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantThe U.S. Department of the Interior
DefendantThe U.S. Office of Management and Budget
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-161COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against The U.S. Department of the Interior, The U.S. Office of Management and Budget (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4974206) filed by State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A NYSOAG FOIA Request to DOI, # 2 Exhibit B NYSOAG FOIA Request to OMB, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-172Summonses Issued as to The U.S. Department of the Interior, The U.S. Office of Management and Budget. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued for The U.S. Office of Management and Budget, # 2 Summons Issued for United States Attorney General, # 3 Summons Issued for United States Attorney)(hmr) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-173G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/10/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar