Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03759
Date Filed2019-12-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning communications sent or received by specified U.S. embassy officials containing certain keywords related to President Trump's business interests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6652656) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons to USAO, # 4 Summons to USAG, # 5 Summons to U.S. Department of State)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-18Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2020-01-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/20/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/19/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/27/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 12/27/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Clay M. Goode)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 01/07/2020)
2020-01-155NOTICE of Appearance by Sian Jones on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-216ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar