Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTONEHILL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE TAX DIVISION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03770
Date Filed2019-12-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPAULINE DALE STONEHILL
Case DescriptionPauline Stonehill, co-executor of Harry Stonehill's estate, submitted a FOIA request to the Tax Division at the Department of Justice for records concerning the remaining issues from multiple requests stretching back decades pertaining to settling Harry Stonehill's estate. The Tax Division acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency Pauline Stonehill filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE TAX DIVISION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-181COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE TAX DIVISION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6658265) filed by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-20Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2019-12-202SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE TAX DIVISION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2020-01-033RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE TAX DIVISION served on 12/30/2019 (Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 01/03/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar