Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWITTES et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03773
Date Filed2019-12-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffBENJAMIN WITTES
PlaintiffSCOTT R. ANDERSON
Case DescriptionBenjamin Wittes and Scott Anderson, editors of Lawfare, submitted two FOIA requests to the FBI for records. Their first FOIA request asked for records concerning any accusations of misconduct against any FBI employee for participating in partisan politics. Their second FOIA request focused on a PowerPoint presentation given to senior officials making specific reference to former FBI employees Lisa Page and Peter Strzok. Wittes and Anderson then made 16 additional FOIA requests for records containing employees' negative statements referring to either Donald Trump or Hillary Clinton. Wittes and Anderson also requested expedited processing and fee waivers for all their requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency Wittes and Anderson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-181COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6658806) filed by BENJAMIN WITTES, SCOTT R. ANDERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Civil Cover Sheet, # 23 Summons to FBI, # 24 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 25 Summons to U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Litt, Robert) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-182REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to F.B.I. filed by BENJAMIN WITTES, SCOTT R. ANDERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U.S Attorney General, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Litt, Robert) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-19Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2019-12-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2020-01-084RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 12/23/2019 (Litt, Robert) (Entered: 01/08/2020)
2020-01-085RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/20/2019. (Litt, Robert) (Entered: 01/08/2020)
2020-01-086RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/20/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/19/2020. (Litt, Robert) (Entered: 01/08/2020)
2020-01-217ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar