Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBlock & Leviton LLP v. Federal Trade Commission
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2019cv12539
Date Filed2019-12-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Patti B. Saris
PlaintiffBlock & Leviton LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Block & Leviton submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Trade Commission for records concerning draft settlement agreements from either the agency or Facebook to settle the FTC's complaint against Facebook. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Block & Leviton that all responsive records were available on the agency's website. Block & Leviton filed an administrative appeal of that decision. The agency responded by telling Block & Leviton that some records were protected by Exemption 4 (confidential business information) and Exemption 5 (privileges). Block & Leviton then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Trade Commission
DefendantFacebook, Inc.
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-181COMPLAINT against Federal Trade Commission Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8020470 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Block & Leviton LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Leviton, Jason) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-182ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-183Summons Issued as to Federal Trade Commission. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2020-01-104SUMMONS Returned Executed by Block & Leviton LLP. (Milgroom, Lauren) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-01-105MOTION to Set 30-Day Response Deadline for Defendant's Response to Complaint in Accordance with FOIA, 5 USC § 552(A)(4)(C) by Block & Leviton LLP.(Milgroom, Lauren) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-01-136Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered granting 5 MOTION to Set 30-Day Response Deadline for Defendant's Response to Complaint in Accordance with FOIA, 5 USC § 552(A)(4)(C). (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-137Answer deadline reset for Federal Trade Commission, due by 1/21/2020. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-218ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Federal Trade Commission.(Weida, Jason) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-249NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.... Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen) (Main Document 9 replaced on 1/27/2020) (Molloy, Maryellen). (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-02-1010JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Milgroom, Lauren) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-1011CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Block & Leviton LLP.(Milgroom, Lauren) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-1012CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Weida, Jason) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-1813MOTION to Intervene by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lipshutz, Joshua) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-02-1814MEMORANDUM in Support re 13 MOTION to Intervene filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lipshutz, Joshua) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar