Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCLEAR et al v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2019cv07079
Date Filed2019-12-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge I. Leo Glasser
PlaintiffCLEAR
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Case DescriptionCreating Law Enforcement Accountability and Responsibility Project of Main Street Legal Services and the ACLU submitted requests to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records relating to the Tactical Terrorism Response Team, a component of CBP that targets people with valid travel documents that present security risks. CLEAR and the ACLU also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CLEAR and the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-181COMPLAINT against U.S. Customs and Border Protection filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12169447 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by CLEAR, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Proposed Summons) (Kim, Scarlet) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-20Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2019-12-202Civil Cover Sheet.. Re 1 Complaint, by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, CLEAR (Kim, Scarlet) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2019-12-20Case assigned to Judge I. Leo Glasser and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2019-12-203Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2019-12-264In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2019-12-265This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2020-01-096SUMMONS Returned Executed by CLEAR, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union. U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Kim, Scarlet) (Entered: 01/09/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar