Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03776
Date Filed2019-12-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor for records concerning certification by the agency's Wage and Hour Division related to U and T visa applications, which are used to protect victims of crime. DFF also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-191COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6661303) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2019-12-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2019-12-19Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2019-12-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2019-12-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/23/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/22/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/23/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR served on 12/20/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2020-01-275ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-27MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 3/2/2020. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/27/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/2/2020. (tb) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar