Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWALKER v. MATTHEW P. DONOVAN
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03784
Date Filed2019-12-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffDAVID B. WALKER
Case DescriptionDavid Walker, who was serving as chief of staff for the Delaware Air National Guard when he received a letter of admonishment accusing him of dereliction of duty, submitted five FOIA requests to the Department of the Air Force for records concerning the basis for the letter of admonishment. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. Walker made several attempts to check on the status of his requests. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Walker filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
DefendantMATTHEW P. DONOVAN Acting Secretary United States Department of the Air Force
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-191COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6664237) filed by DAVID B WALKER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J)(Rapp-Tully, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2019-12-20Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2019-12-202SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to MATTHEW P. DONOVAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2020-01-213RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/3/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rapp-Tully, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-214RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/3/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/2/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rapp-Tully, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW P. DONOVAN served on 1/2/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rapp-Tully, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar