Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleShapiro v. United States Social Security Administration
DistrictDistrict of Vermont
CityBurlington
Case Number2:2019cv00238
Date Filed2019-12-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christina Reiss
PlaintiffRobert E. Shapiro
Case DescriptionRobert Shapiro submitted a FOIA request to the Social Security Administration for records concerning guidance on SSA disability payments for migraine headaches. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and gave Shapiro an estimated cost of $2,908 for processing his request. Shapiro submitted the payment. However, according to Shapiro, the agency only responded to two-thirds of the items listed in his request. Shapiro filed an administrative appeal of the agency's response. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees - Advance Payment, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCommissioner of Social Security
DefendantUnited States Social Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Opinion/Order [25]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-201COMPLAINT against United States Social Security Administration filed by Robert E. Shapiro. Summonses issued. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac) Deft name clarified on 12/23/2019 (law). (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2019-12-202NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin G. Sherman, Esq. on behalf of Robert E. Shapiro. (pac) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2020-01-143ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. United States Social Security Administration served on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sherman, Justin) Answer due date corrected on 1/16/2020 (jlh). (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-164NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: 3 Acknowledgment/Acceptance of Service filed by Robert E. Shapiro. Docket text has been clarified to read United States Social Security Administration served on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (jlh) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-295UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by United States Social Security Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Jason) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-02-116ORDER GRANTING 5 First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 2/10/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-03-037UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint filed by United States Social Security Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Jason) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-038ORDER granting 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. United States Social Security Administration answer due 5/4/2020. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 3/3/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (law) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-05-049ANSWER to Complaint by United States Social Security Administration.(Turner, Jason) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-0510STIPULATED DISCOVERY LETTER SENT re: no stipulated discovery schedule filed; case will be set for a scheduling conference unless stipulated schedule is filed. (jbr) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-06-0211NOTICE of Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by United States Social Security Administration (Turner, Jason) Text clarified on 6/2/2020 (law). (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-0212JOINT BRIEFING SCHEDULE - Dft Summary Judgment Motion due by 7/24/2020; ptlf's combined Motion for Summary Judgment/Opposition due 60 days thereafter; and dft Reply Brief due 21 days after pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 6/2/2020. (kp) (Entered: 06/03/2020)
2020-06-1213DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Robert E. Shapiro.(Sherman, Justin) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-07-2414MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, or, in the alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Social Security Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Turner, Jason) Added MOTION to Dismiss on 7/27/2020 (law). (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-09-2215RESPONSE to Statement of Undisputed Material Fact and Statement of Disputed Fact re 14 MOTION to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Robert E. Shapiro. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sherman, Justin) Text clarified on 9/24/2020 (law). (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-2216CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert E. Shapiro. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Robert E. Shapiro, # 2 Certificate of Service) (same document as 17 ) (Sherman, Justin) Text clarified on 9/24/2020 (law). (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-2217RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, or, in the alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert E. Shapiro. (same documents as 16 ) (kp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2020: # 1 Affidavit of Robert E. Shaprio, # 2 Certificate of Service) (law). (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-10-1318RESPONSE to 15 Statement of Disputed Facts re: 14 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States Social Security Administration. (Turner, Jason) Link added on 10/14/2020 (law). (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-1319RESPONSE in Opposition to 16 CROSS-MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Social Security Administration. (same document as 20 ) (Turner, Jason) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-1320REPLY to Response to 14 MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Social Security Administration. (same document as 19 ) (law) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-2721REPLY to Response to 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert E. Shapiro. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sherman, Justin) Text clarified on 10/30/2020 (law). (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-2922AGREED-TO MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply re: 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Social Security. Administration.(Turner, Jason) Link added on 10/30/2020 (law). (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-10-3023ORDER GRANTING 22 Agreed-to Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply re: 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/30/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-11-0324SUR-REPLY to 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Social Security Administration. (Turner, Jason) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2021-03-0825OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 14 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, or, in the alternative Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 16 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. The court ORDERS Defendant to specify a basis for withholding the initial 1,377 responsive documents identified under Exemptions 5 and 6 within thirty (30) days of this Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 3/8/2021. (kp) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-04-0726RESPONSE in Support re 14 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Social Security Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Turner, Jason) (Entered: 04/07/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar