Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSierra Club v. U.S. Department of Interior et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2019cv08288
Date Filed2019-12-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffSierra Club
Case DescriptionThe Sierra Club submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Surface Mining for records concerning for consultations with the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service under the Endangered Species Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after the Sierra Club made several unsuccessful attempts to check the status of the request, the Sierra Club filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Interior
DefendantOffice of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-191COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, U.S. Department of Interior ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13996862.). Filed bySierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Swearingen, Van) (Filed on 12/19/2019) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2019-12-192Proposed Summons. (Swearingen, Van) (Filed on 12/19/2019) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2019-12-193Certificate of Interested Entities by Sierra Club (Swearingen, Van) (Filed on 12/19/2019) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2019-12-204Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2019-12-205Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2019-12-206Summons Issued as to Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, U.S. Department of Interior.(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2019-12-237CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sierra Club.. (Swearingen, Van) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2020-01-138CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sierra Club Proof of Service on an Agency or Corporation of the United States (Swearingen, Van) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-159STIPULATION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint for Declaratory & Injunctive Relief filed by Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, U.S. Department of Interior. (Reagin, Julie) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-1610CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/30/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-1711CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, U.S. Department of Interior.. (Reagin, Julie) (Filed on 1/17/2020) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar