Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGolden State Salmon Association et al v. United States Bureau of Reclamation
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2019cv08319
Date Filed2019-12-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jon S. Tigar
PlaintiffGolden State Salmon Association
PlaintiffPacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations
PlaintiffInstitute for Fisheries Resources
PlaintiffFriends of the River
PlaintiffSierra Club
Case DescriptionThe Golden State Salmon Association, the Sierra Club, and other advocacy groups submitted three FOIA requests to the Bureau of Reclamation for records concerning the agency's discussions and agreements with any potential or confirmed non-federal cost-share partners regarding the project to raise the height of Shasta Dam. The requests also asked for a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and placed them on their complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of the requests, the Golden State Salmon Association, the Sierra Club and the other organizations filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Bureau of Reclamation
DefendantBureau of Reclamation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-201COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Bureau of Reclamation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14001024.). Filed byGolden State Salmon Association, Friends of the River, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Sierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Logan, Marie) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2019-12-202Certificate of Interested Entities by Friends of the River, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Sierra Club (Robertson, Nina) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2019-12-233Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/6/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2019-12-23Electronic filing error . The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The correct event is Proposed Summons. The correct event can be found at Ci vil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. This filing will not be processed by the clerk's office. Please re-file the proposed summons using the instructions above. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2019-12-234Proposed Summons. (Logan, Marie) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2019-12-245Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)
2019-12-246Summons Issued as to United States Bureau of Reclamation.(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)
2020-01-067CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Friends of the River, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Sierra Club.. (Logan, Marie) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-01-068CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Friends of the River, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Sierra Club re 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 6 Summons Issued as to USA, 1 Complaint, 2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Robertson, Nina) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-01-069CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-01-0710ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 01/07/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)
2020-01-07Electronic filing error . Judge initials are missing. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge initials, JST, on future filings. Re: 8 Certi ficate of Service, filed by Friends of the River, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Sierra Club, Golden State Salmon Association (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)
2020-01-0811CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)
2020-01-0812CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Friends of the River, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Sierra Club re 10 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, 11 Clerk's Notice (Logan, Marie) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)
2020-01-2313NOTICE of Appearance by Emmet P. Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 1/23/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-01-2314STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING filed by United States Bureau of Reclamation. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 1/23/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar