Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03807
Date Filed2019-12-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a request to the CIA for records concerning CIA official Eric Ciaramella, who conservative media allege is the whistleblower who filed a complaint about President Trump's phone call to Ukraine. After hear nothing further from the agency, it submitted a second FOIA request for records on Ciaramella, this time asking for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-231COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6671027) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Central Intelligence Agency)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2019-12-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2019-12-26Case assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmc) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2019-12-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2020-01-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/3/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/2/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/03/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 1/3/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar