Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAndreacchio et al v. Mcallister
DistrictSouthern District of Mississippi
CityNorthern Jackson
Case Number3:2020cv00002
Date Filed2020-01-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Henry T. Wingate
PlaintiffTodd Andreacchio
PlaintiffRae Andreacchio
Case DescriptionTodd and Rae Andrecchio filed suit against Ritchie McAllister, the chief administrative officer of Meriden, Mississippi, for invasion of privacy. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantRitchie Mcallister
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-021NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ritchie Mcallister from Lauderdale Count CIrcuit Court, case number 19cv121(B). ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4172337) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Summons and State Court Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB) (Entered: 01/03/2020)
2020-01-062Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-01-093ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ritchie Mcallister.(Kendrick, Kermit) (Entered: 01/09/2020)
2020-01-094NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua W. Stover on behalf of Ritchie Mcallister (Stover, Joshua) (Entered: 01/09/2020)
2020-01-135MOTION to Dismiss or for Judgment on the Pleadings by Ritchie Mcallister (Kendrick, Kermit) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-136MEMORANDUM in Support re 5 MOTION to Dismiss or for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Ritchie Mcallister (Kendrick, Kermit) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-157State Court Record by Defendant Ritchie Mcallister (Kendrick, Kermit) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar