Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSatterfield & Pontikes Construction, Inc. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00076
Date Filed2020-01-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffSATTERFIELD & PONTIKES CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Case DescriptionSatterfield & Pontikes Construction submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of the Navy for records concerning construction at the Navy facility in Gulfport, MS, particularly records submitted by Whiting Turner Contracting Company. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told Satterfield & Pontikes that the cost of providing the records would be $2,724. Satterfield & Pontikes agreed to pay the fees but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Satterfield & Pontikes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-131COMPLAINT Satterfield & Pontikes Construction, Inc. against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6725891) filed by Satterfield & Pontikes Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons - Dept. of Navy, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Declaration S&P's Financial Interest Disclosure Statement)(Brown, Lee-Ann) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-14Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-142STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/14/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-03-13MINUTE ORDER. The Plaintiff filed its Complaint in this action on January 13, 2020. As of the date of this Order, the public docket reflects that the Plaintiff has yet to file proof of service of the Defendant. The Court directs the Plaintiff's attention to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) and Local Civil Rule 5.3. It is hereby ORDERED that, by no later than April 13, 2020, the Plaintiff must either cause process to be served upon the Defendant and file proof of service with the Court or establish good cause for the failure to do so. Failure to make such filings will result in dismissal of this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/13/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's proof of service due by 4/13/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar