Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInternational Refugee Assistance Project, Inc. v. Defense Contract Management Agency et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv00306
Date Filed2020-01-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Alvin K. Hellerstein
PlaintiffInternational Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe International Refugee Assistance Project submitted a FOIA request to the Defense Contract Management Agency for records concerning contracts between the U.S. government and any company that employed or subcontracted with any entity that employed Afghan citizens eligible for special immigrant visas. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, IRAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDefense Contract Management Agency
DefendantU.S. Department of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-131COMPLAINT against Defense Contract Management Agency, U.S. Department of Defense. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18490509)Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Browning, John) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-132REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defense Contract Management Agency; U.S. Department of Defense, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.. (Browning, John) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-133CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Browning, John) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-134RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc..(Browning, John) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-14CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . (pc) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-14Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-14Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-145ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defense Contract Management Agency, U.S. Department of Defense. (pc) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-02-046FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Browning, John) Modified on 2/5/2020 (dnh). (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-047AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Browning, John) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-048AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Browning, John) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-049AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Browning, John) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-0410AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Browning, John) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-05***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Moses Browning to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As To' Error; Summonses may only be issued to official parties of record. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-1811CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Dominika Tarczynska dated February 18, 2020. Document filed by Defense Contract Management Agency, U.S. Department of Defense..(Tarczynska, Dominika) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-02-1812AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Browning, John) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-02-1913ORDER granting 11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint,. So Ordered. (Defense Contract Management Agency answer due 3/23/2020; U.S. Department of Defense answer due 3/23/2020.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/19/20) (yv) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar