Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLangton v. United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictDistrict of Arizona
CityPhoenix Division
Case Number2:2020cv00099
Date Filed2020-01-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge John Z Boyle
PlaintiffDarrin Langton
Case DescriptionDarrin Langston submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency issued a Glomar response, citing intelligence sources and methods under Exemption 3 (other statutes). Langston filed an administrative appeal. The agency told Langston that his appeal was heard by the Office of the Chief Administrative Law Judge at the U.S. Coast Guard. That office had reviewed the agency's original decision and upheld its use of a Glomar response. Langston then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-141COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17834077 filed by Darrin Langton. (Horne, Mark) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-142SUMMONS Submitted by Darrin Langton. (Horne, Mark) (BAC) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-143Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17834077. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00099-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-144Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-145NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-02-036Order that Darrin Langton show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/18/2020 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: # 1 Instructions, # 2 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-048Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-059MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for February 18, 2020 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar