Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePERIOPERATIVE SERVICES AND LOGISTICS, LLC v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00095
Date Filed2020-01-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffPERIOPERATIVE SERVICES AND LOGISTICS, LLC
Case DescriptionPerioperative Services and Logistics, a supplier of medical implant materials, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning complaints made against Perioperative. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency responded to the request by telling Perioperative that it had found two responsive pages but they were being withheld under Exemption 5 (privileges). Perioperative filed an administrative appeal of that decision. The agency responded to Perioperative's appeal by telling the company that the original withholding decision based on the attorney-client privilege was incorrect but that the two pages were still being withheld under another privilege as well as Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Perioperative Services and Logistics then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-141COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6730451) filed by PERIOPERATIVE SERVICES AND LOGISTICS, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. 1, # 2 Exhibit Exh. 2, # 3 Exhibit Exh. 3, # 4 Exhibit Exh. 4, # 5 Errata Exh. 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons The Honorable Jessi K. Liu, # 8 Summons The Honorable William Barr, # 9 Summons The Honorable Robert L. Wilkie)(Tolchin, Edward) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-15Case assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmc) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-152SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-293RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/27/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/26/2020. (Tolchin, Edward) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 1/27/2020 (Tolchin, Edward) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-02-075RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/27/2020. (Tolchin, Edward) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-02-266NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-267ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS.(Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-278ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before March 27, 2020. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/27/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-03-249Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-24MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must file its dispositive motion by May 11, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/24/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar