Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDOCUMENTED v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00107
Date Filed2020-01-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffDOCUMENTED
Case DescriptionDocumented, Inc., a watchdog group that investigates corporate influence over public policy, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Interior for communications between various officials and outside groups. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests Documented, Inc. filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-151COMPLAINT against DOCUMENTED ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6735112) filed by DOCUMENTED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Supplement)(Kole, Allison) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-152ERRATA by DOCUMENTED. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Kole, Allison) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-153LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DOCUMENTED (zmc) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-164REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by DOCUMENTED. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Kole, Allison) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-21Case assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmc) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-215SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-02-216NOTICE of Appearance by Sian Jones on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-267ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-26MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before March 12, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/26/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-03-128Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before May 11, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/12/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/11/2020. (tj) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/11/2020 (tj) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar