Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHarvey v. United States of America Department of Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictEastern District of Washington
CitySpokane
Case Number2:2020cv00025
Date Filed2020-01-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rosanna Malouf Peterson
PlaintiffJesse Aaron Harvey
Case DescriptionJessie Harvey submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning his detention by Washington State police. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Harvey filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States of America Department of Federal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-151COMPLAINT against United States of America Department of Federal Bureau of Investigation (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # IFP Pending) Filed by Jesse Aaron Harvey. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CLP, Case Administrator) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-15Summons Issued as to United States of America Department of Federal Bureau of Investigation. (CLP, Case Administrator) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-163ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals an incomplete Application. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (CLP, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar