Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00124
Date Filed2020-01-16
Date Closed2021-08-18
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the agency's use of the social media app CrowdTangle to monitor the social media use of journalists, reporters, or media commentators. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [24]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6740165) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-21Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-274NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Blaine Aldrich on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/28/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/27/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/28/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 1/28/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-02-276NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-277ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-27MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by Thursday, March 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 02/27/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-03-128Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-12MINUTE ORDER: In light of 8 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before April 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/12/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/13/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-04-139Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/13/2020)
2020-04-14MINUTE ORDER: In light of 9 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before June 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 04/14/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-06-1510Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-06-17MINUTE ORDER: In light of 10 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before August 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 06/17/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/15/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-08-1411Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-17MINUTE ORDER: In light of 11 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before October 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/17/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/17/2020)
2020-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/15/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 08/17/2020)
2020-10-1512Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-15STATUS REPORT MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 12 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before 12/15/2020. If any disputes remain, the Joint Status Report due 12/15/2020 shall include a proposed schedule for prompt summary judgment briefing. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/15/2020. (lccrc3) Modified to add "minute" on 10/21/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-12-1513Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 13 Joint Status Report, the Court hereby sets the following deadlines for briefing on any disputes that may remain after the anticipated production of the Vaughn index. Defendant shall file any motion for summary judgment on or before February 18, 2021. Plaintiff shall file any cross-motion for summary judgment, together with its opposition to defendant's motion, by March 4, 2021. Defendant shall file any reply in support of its motion for summary judgment, together with its response to plaintiff's cross-motion, by March 18, 2021. Plaintiff shall file any reply in support of its cross-motion on or before April 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/21/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2021-02-1814MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration of Eric F. Stein, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-03-0315Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aldrich, Jason) Modified event on 3/3/2021 (ztd). (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-04MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall file its opposition to the 14 Motion for Summary Judgment on or before March 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/04/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-2216Memorandum in opposition to re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-2217Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-2918Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
2021-03-30MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant shall file its combined reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment on or before April 19, 2021. Plaintiff's reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment is due May 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/30/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 03/30/2021)
2021-04-1919REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric F. Stein)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/19/2021)
2021-04-1920Memorandum in opposition to re 17 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric F. Stein)(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/19/2021)
2021-05-0421REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 05/04/2021)
2021-07-15MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ordered that, on or before July 22, 2021, defendant shall submit to the Court ex parte: (1) unredacted versions of the documents identified in defendant's Vaughn indexes as Documents 7 and 8; and (2) redacted versions of Documents 7 and 8 reflecting which portions of those documents have been withheld from plaintiff. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 07/15/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/15/2021)
2021-07-2122NOTICE of Delivery of Documents for In Camera Inspection by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 07/21/2021)
2021-08-1723ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, and denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. See full Order and accompanying Memorandum Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/17/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/17/2021)
2021-08-1724MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 23 Order granting 14 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgement. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/17/2021. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/17/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar