Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00126
Date Filed2020-01-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the monitoring of journalists. The agency acknowledged request of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6740205) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-21Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-274NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Blaine Aldrich on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/28/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/27/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/28/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 1/28/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-02-196NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-277ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Burch, Alan) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-03-01MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) appear to be inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report by March 23, 2020. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 1, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 03/01/2020)
2020-03-01Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/23/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-238Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-25MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by May 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 25, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-03-25Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/22/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar