Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLeahey v. Fine
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2020cv00083
Date Filed2020-01-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ricardo S. Martinez
PlaintiffMichael J Leahey
Case DescriptionMichael Leahey submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Inspector General of the Department of Defense for records concerning an investigation. The agency denied his request. Leahey filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leahey filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantGlenn A Fine the Honorable, Inspector General (Acting), Department of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-171COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Glenn A Fine (Summons(es) not received to issue) (Receipt # SEA99637), filed by Michael J Leahey. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CDA) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-172LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (CDA) Modified on 1/17/2020 cc plaintiff via US Mail (CDA). (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-02-183NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons; filed by Plaintiff Michael J Leahey. (MW) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-204ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 4/2/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/19/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/26/2020, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. cc:Plaintiff via USPS (LW) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-03-165NOTICE of Letter from General Counsel of the Inspector General, Dept of Defense re: lack of proper service; filed by Plaintiff Michael J Leahey. (PM) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-316**REVISED** ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Per request of pro se plaintiff, the initial case deadlines are continued as follows: Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/28/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/4/2020. (LC) Modified on 3/31/2020: cc of Revised Order mailed to plaintiff via regular mail (LC). (Entered: 03/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar