Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCULLEN v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00113
Date Filed2020-01-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffRUSSELL H. CULLEN
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-13Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 1/13/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-01-131COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY with Jury Demand filed by RUSSELL H. CULLEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (zmd) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-01-132MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RUSSELL H. CULLEN (zmd) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-01-133PARTIAL PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT (INMATE INQUIRY) by RUSSELL H. CULLEN (zmd) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-01-304ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $33.96 from Prison Account of RUSSELL H. CULLEN and granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/27/2020. (zrdj) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-06Case assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmc) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-065SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmc) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/13/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/14/2020. (ztth) (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-03-067RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/5/2020. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/5/2020. (ztth) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-099RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/6/2020. (ztth) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-128MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-12MINUTE ORDER treating as opposed and granting, for good cause shown, Defendant's 8 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint by April 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/12/2020. (lctjk3) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-1610MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint by RUSSELL H. CULLEN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Complaint, # 2 Summons); "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/16/2020. (ztth) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-19MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response, if any, to Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Amend Complaint by March 27, 2020. Plaintiff is reminded that he must serve all motions on Defendants in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(a),(b) and must file a certificate of service with any motions in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d). Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/19/2020. (lctjk3) (Entered: 03/19/2020)
2020-03-2711RESPONSE re 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar