Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00150
Date Filed2020-01-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning an op-ed by Deputy Director William Pendley. PEER also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. PEER contacted the agency concerning the status of its request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-211COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6750367) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration 26.1 statement, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 3 Summons Attorney General Summons, # 4 Summons USAO summons, # 5 Summons Agency Summons)(Jenkins, Peter) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (zmc) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-01-22Case assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmc) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-01-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-01-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/28/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/27/2020. (Jenkins, Peter) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 1/28/2020 (Jenkins, Peter) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/28/2020. (Jenkins, Peter) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-317NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-318CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY re Motion for Prelim. Injunction . (Jenkins, Peter) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-319MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Peter T. Jenkins, # 2 Declaration Timothy Whitehouse, # 3 Declaration Edward Patrovsky, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Jenkins, Peter) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-02-0610Unopposed MOTION to Stay re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jenkins, Peter) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-0611Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-06MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Plaintiff's 10 Unopposed Motion to Stay Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is hereby STAYED until further action by the Court. Defendant's obligation to respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint under 5 U.S.C. § 552(a)(4)(C) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a) remains in effect. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 6, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar