Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00172
Date Filed2020-01-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionProtect Democracy Project submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice, the Department of Defense, and the Department of State for records concerning the military strike that killed Qassim Soleimani and discussions of the President's authority to conduct the strike. PDP also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, PDP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-221COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6756736) filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons)(Tindall, Anne) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-01-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Tindall, Anne) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-01-223WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED ON 2/3/2020..... MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Anne H. Tindall, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Declaration of Ian Bassin (Ex. K))(Tindall, Anne); Modified on 2/4/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-01-23Case assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmc) (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-01-234SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-01-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/27/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Delivery confirmation, # 2 Receipt)(Tindall, Anne) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 1/27/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Delivery confirmation, # 2 Receipt)(Tindall, Anne) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 1/27/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Delivery confirmation, # 2 Receipt)(Tindall, Anne) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-288ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. on January 27, 2020, as to U.S. Attorney General, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4(i) . (Tindall, Anne) Modified on 1/29/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-289ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. on January 27, 2020, as to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4(i) . (Tindall, Anne) Modified on 1/29/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-29NOTICE OF ERROR re 8 Certificate of Service; emailed to anne.tindall@protectdemocracy.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. The correct event can be found under the Service of Process heading. (ztth, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-29NOTICE OF ERROR re 9 Certificate of Service; emailed to anne.tindall@protectdemocracy.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. The correct event can be found under the Service of Process heading. (ztth, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-3110NOTICE of Appearance by Kari E. D'Ottavio on behalf of All Defendants (D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-02-0311NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION re 3 by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Tindall, Anne) Modified to add link on 2/5/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-1912MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John Paredes, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6845023. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Paredes, # 2 Proposed Order)(Tindall, Anne) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-1913AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Tindall, Anne) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-1914MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Anne H. Tindall, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Proposed Order)(Tindall, Anne) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-1915Emergency MOTION for expedited briefing and argument schedule re 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tindall, Anne) Modified event on 2/20/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-24MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that John Paredes is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/24/2020. (l crc1) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-02-2616NOTICE of Appearance by Eric John Galvez Paredes on behalf of PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Paredes, Eric John) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-2617Memorandum in opposition to re 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-03-0318NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Leon Berwick on behalf of PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-0319REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Paredes, # 2 Exhibit N)(Paredes, Eric John) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-0420ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-06MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a hearing on 14 Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is scheduled for March 12, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, on March 11, 2020, Defendants file updated versions of the declarations supporting their 17 memorandum in opposition to the motion. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/6/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-09Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-1121NOTICE with Updated Declarations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-1222NOTICE of Legislation by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-12MINUTE ORDER: As stated on the record during the hearing on March 12, 2020, a further hearing is scheduled for March 19, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall, sometime before 12:00 noon on March 19, 2020, submit a filing on behalf of OLC indicating whether it possesses a memorandum or opinion responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/12/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-12Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Motion Hearing held on 3/12/2020 re 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. Government brief due by 3/19/2020. Next Hearing set for 3/19/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras.). (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira.) (tj) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-1623Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at the March 19, 2020 Hearing by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Paredes, Eric John) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-16MINUTE ORDER: In light of the concerns raised in 23 the joint motion concerning the coronavirus (COVID-19), but given that a teleconference would implicate similar concerns by requiring court personnel (including a courtroom deputy, court reporter, etc.) to travel to the courthouse, the upcoming hearing is hereby VACATED and the parties shall, instead, by close of business on March 19, 2020, submit written proposed schedules to govern this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/16/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-17NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 23 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at the March 19, 2020 Hearing . In the future said document should be filed in pleading format. Please refer to LCvR 5.1(a). (ztth) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-1724NOTICE Regarding Escalating Hostilities with Iran by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Tindall, Anne) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Schedules due by 3/19/2020. (tj) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-1925NOTICE of OLC memorandum by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 03/19/2020)
2020-03-1926Joint STATUS REPORT and Partial Proposed Schedules by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Paredes, Eric John) (Entered: 03/19/2020)
2020-03-2427TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on March 12, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-25. Date of Issuance:March 24, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (202) 354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the cour t reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/14/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2020.(Moreira, Lisa) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 26 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 3, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/26/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/26/2020)
2020-03-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/3/2020 (tj) (Entered: 03/26/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar