Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSalgado-Rios v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictWestern District of Michigan
CitySouthern Division
Case Number1:2020cv00060
Date Filed2020-01-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Paul L. Maloney
PlaintiffYolanda Salgado-Rios
Case DescriptionYolanda Salgado-Rios submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning herself and her daughter. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Salgado-Rios filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-241COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Yolanda Salgado-Rios (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-24FILING FEE PAID re 1 by plaintiff Yolanda Salgado-Rios in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4836226 (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-242PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-243NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-244SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ns) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-285UNOPPOSED MOTION to amend/correct 4 Summons by plaintiff Yolanda Salgado-Rios; (Asch, Marc) Modified text on 1/30/2020 (ns). (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-286CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION to amend/correct 4 Summons 5 filed by Yolanda Salgado-Rios (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-317ORDER granting 5 motion to amend/correct summons; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-318CORRECTED SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ns) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-319CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Yolanda Salgado-Rios re Order on Motion to Amend/Correct 7 (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-02-1810SUMMONS returned executed on Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, Department of Homeland Security complete on 2/3/2020, answer due 4/3/2020; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services complete on 2/3/2020, answer due 4/3/2020; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement complete on 2/3/2020, answer due 4/3/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit declaration regarding service) (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-02-2111PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Response by defendants Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement [Attorney Laura Ann Babinsky added to party Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Ann Babinsky added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Ann Babinsky added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft)] (Babinsky, Laura) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-2112ORDER approving STIPULATION 11 ; deadline for federal defendants to file responsive pleading extended to 3/11/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-03-1113MOTION to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment by defendants Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement; (Babinsky, Laura) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-1114BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment 13 filed by Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 - Declaration of Jill Eggleston, # 2 Attachment 2 - Declaration of Toni Fuentes) (Babinsky, Laura) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-1115CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion, 14 filed by Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Babinsky, Laura) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-2716PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to extend deadline for responsive brief by plaintiff Yolanda Salgado-Rios (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-03-3017ORDER approving STIPULATION 16 ; deadline for plaintiff to file response to defendants' motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment is extended to 4/29/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar