Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWright v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityDallas
Case Number3:2020cv00173
Date Filed2020-01-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge A. Joe Fish
PlaintiffMakala Kierra Wright
Case DescriptionMakala Kierra Wright submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning herself. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Wright that it could neither confirm nor deny the existence of records pertaining to whether an individual was on the terrorist watchlist. Wright filed an administrative appeal. She also contacted the Office of Government Information Services. After hearing nothing further, Wright filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-231New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the national and circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-232Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (oyh) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-233COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation filed by Makala Kierra Wright. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (oyh) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-234MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Makala Kierra Wright. (oyh) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-295ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SPECIFYING FURTHER ACTION TO BE TAKEN BY THE CLERK, AND REQUIRING SERVICE BY THE MARSHAL granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/29/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-296Summons issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ykp) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-297Business Reply Card signed by USMS; re 3 Complaint, 5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, 6 Summons Issued, 1 Consent. Signed on 1/29/2020. (ykp) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-03-058SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the U.S. Attorney General; served on 2/4/2020. (hml) Modified on 3/5/2020 (axm). (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-059SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the Federal Bureau of Investigation; served on 2/4/2020. (hml) Modified on 3/5/2020 (axm). (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-0510SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney; served on 2/13/2020. (hml) Modified on 3/5/2020 (axm). (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-0911***PLEASE DISREGARD REFILED AS 12 *** Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) , Motion for Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) , MOTION to Intervene , MOTION to Join , MOTION for Judgment , MOTION for Judgment Based on ADR Settlement () filed by Makala Kierra Wright (Wright, Makala) Modified on 3/9/2020 (ndt). (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-0912MOTION Cease and Desist filed by Makala Kierra Wright (Wright, Makala) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-0913NOTICE of Evidence filed by Makala Kierra Wright (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Possible Spyware, # 2 Exhibit(s) Defamation of character, # 3 Exhibit(s) Defamation of character) (Wright, Makala) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-1614ANSWER to 3 Complaint,, filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Clayton Ray Mahaffey-DOJ added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft) (Mahaffey-DOJ, Clayton) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-1615CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Mahaffey-DOJ, Clayton) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-1616First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Makala Kierra Wright (Wright, Makala) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-1817ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE AS TO VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Defendant to file, by 4/17/2020, a response to Wright's motion [Dkt. No. 16 ] or, alternatively, a stipulation of dismissal in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 3/18/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar