Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00198
Date Filed2020-01-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted two FOIA requests to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau for records concerning communications with the American Consumer Financial Network and actions to persuade states to lower consumer protections. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests but after hearing anything further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-241COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6764584) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Miller, Kristen) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-242LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Miller, Kristen) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-27Case assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmc) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-02-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 1/30/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/3/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/4/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/31/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Miller, Kristen) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-03-045NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-046ANSWER to Complaint by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU.(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-12MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before April 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 12, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar