Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInformed Consent Action Network v. United States Food and Drug Administration
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv00689
Date Filed2020-01-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Alison J. Nathan
PlaintiffInformed Consent Action Network
Case DescriptionThe Informed Consent Action Network submitted a FOIA request for records concerning clinical trials relied upon to approve Engerix-B for babies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After asking the Informed Consent Action Network to clarify its request, the agency indicated that it could not search for records responsive to the request for clinical trials. Informed Consent Action Network then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Food and Drug Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-241COMPLAINT against United States Food and Drug Administration. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18594662)Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network.(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-242CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-243REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Food and Drug Administration, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-27CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . (pne) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-27Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pne) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-27Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-274ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Food and Drug Administration. (pne) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-02-035NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, June 5, 2020 at 3:00pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The parties are hereby ORDERED to ECF file a Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order no later than seven days prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order available at the Court's website (http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Nathan). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that included with the Proposed Civil Case Management Plan, the parties jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have noticed an appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed to notify all other parties attorneys in this action by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules (available at the Court's website, http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Nathan) forthwith. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and Individual Rules to that party personally. (Initial Conference set for 6/5/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/3/20) (yv) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-046NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Hilliard Dolinger on behalf of United States Food and Drug Administration..(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-107AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network..(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-288ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Food and Drug Administration..(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-03-179AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against United States Food and Drug Administration.Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. Related document: 1 Complaint..(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-2410ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint. Document filed by United States Food and Drug Administration..(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar