Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv00608
Date Filed2020-01-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Sallie Kim
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
PlaintiffAura Bogado
Case DescriptionAura Bogado, a reporter for the Center for Investigative Reporting, submitted five FOIA requests to the Administration for Children and Families for records concerning electronic entries of unaccompanied minor children. CIR also requested a fee waiver for each request. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, Bogado and CIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-271COMPLAINT against Department of Health and Human Services ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14111465.). Filed byThe Center for Investigative Reporting, Aura Bogado. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 1/27/2020) Modified on 2/5/2020 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-272Certificate of Interested Entities by Aura Bogado, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-273Certificate of Interested Entities by Aura Bogado, The Center for Investigative Reporting Amended Certificate of Interested Entities (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-274Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-285Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/11/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-286Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-297Summons Issued as to Department of Health and Human Services. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-298CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aura Bogado, The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 1/29/2020) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-02-059CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aura Bogado, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 2/5/2020) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-03-0910ANSWER to Complaint byDepartment of Health and Human Services. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 3/9/2020) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-1011CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/24/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms.(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-1712CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Department of Health and Human Services.. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-04-0713ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020) (Entered: 04/07/2020)
2020-04-0714ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 4/7/2020) (Entered: 04/07/2020)
2020-04-0715ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 4/7/2020) (Entered: 04/07/2020)
2020-04-1716CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Upcoming Hearing on 4/27/2020: Notice is given that the Case Management Conference on 4/27/2020 at 1:30 PM will be conducted by telephone. The hearing may be accessed using the following dial-in information: Dial in: (877) 336-1831 Passcode: 1598603 Counsel is directed to dial in five minutes prior to the start of the hearing and keep the line on mute during other matters. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-2017STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial CMC and Exempt Parties From Rule 26 Requirements filed by Department of Health and Human Services. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 4/20/2020) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-04-2218ORDER AS MODIFIED by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 17 Stipulation to Continue Initial CMC and Exempt Parties From Rule 26 Requirements. Interim Status Report due by 5/22/2020. Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/20/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020) (Entered: 04/22/2020)
2020-05-2219STATUS REPORT (Interim) by Department of Health and Human Services. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 5/22/2020) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-07-1320STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Department of Health and Human Services. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-1421ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/24/2020 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/14/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-08-1322JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Department of Health and Human Services. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-1723ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/28/2020 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/17/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Entered: 08/17/2020)
2020-09-2124JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Department of Health and Human Services. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 9/21/2020) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-2125ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/23/2020 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 9/21/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-11-1626JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Department of Health and Human Services. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 11/16/2020) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-11-1727ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/4/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on 11/17/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-12-2128JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Department of Health and Human Services. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 12/21/2020) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-2229ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Joint Status Report due by 1/25/2021. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/1/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 12/22/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2021-01-2530STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Department of Health and Human Services. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 1/25/2021) (Entered: 01/25/2021)
2021-02-2431STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference filed by Department of Health and Human Services. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 2/24/2021) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-02-2532ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 31 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/5/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-03-2933STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference filed by Department of Health and Human Services. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 3/29/2021) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
2021-03-3034ORDER by Judge Sallie Kim granting 33 Stipulation. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021) (Entered: 03/30/2021)
2021-03-30Set Deadlines/Hearings:.Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 5/3/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court pro ceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021) (Entered: 03/30/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar