Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP v. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00204
Date Filed2020-01-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen Health Research Group filed a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning analyses,and recommendations of the prescription drug Balversa. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told PCHRG that it was placing the request on the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PCHRG filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-271COMPLAINT against U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6767482) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons (U.S. Attorney), # 3 Summons (Attorney General), # 4 Summons (Agency))(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN HEALTH RESEARCH GROUP (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-28Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/28/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/27/2020. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-315ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/31/20. (DM) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-02-056NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar