Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00206
Date Filed2020-01-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffGUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC
Case DescriptionGun Owners of America submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the NICIS Indices Self-Submission Form, allowing otherwise eligible persons to report themselves to the federal government as ineligible to purchase or possess firearms. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Gun Owners of America that it expected to complete the request in 1,591 days. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Gun Owners of America filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-271COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6768043) filed by GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Summons to the US Attorney, # 5 Summons to the Attorney General, # 6 Summons to the FBI)(Olson, Robert) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC (Olson, Robert) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-28Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-294GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/29/2020. (jag) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar