Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDERNESS SOCIETY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00207
Date Filed2020-01-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffWILDERNESS SOCIETY
Case DescriptionThe Wilderness Society submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Interior, the Department of Agriculture, OMB, and the Council on Environmental Quality for records concerning the Colorado Outdoor Recreation and Economy Act (CORE), particularly testimony by Interior and Agriculture before the House Natural Resources Committee. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, the Wilderness Society filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-271COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6768491) filed by WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Civil Process Clerk, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Dept. of Interior, # 5 Summons Office of Management and Budget, # 6 Summons U.S. Dept. of Agriculture)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDERNESS SOCIETY (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-273MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Maya L. Kane, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6768567. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILDERNESS SOCIETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maya L. Kane, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-28Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-284STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/28/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-28MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click f or instructions . Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/28/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-285SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-286NOTICE of Appearance by Maya L. Kane on behalf of WILDERNESS SOCIETY (Kane, Maya) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-02-047RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/3/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/4/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kane, Maya) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/4/2020) (zeg). (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-048RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/3/20. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Kane, Maya) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/4/2020) (zeg). Modified on 2/4/2020 to correct serve date (zeg). (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-049RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 2/3/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Kane, Maya) (Main Document 9 replaced on 2/4/2020) (zeg). (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-0410RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 2/3/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Kane, Maya) (Main Document 10 replaced on 2/4/2020) (zeg). (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-1811RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 2/7/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service Office of Management and Budget)(Kane, Maya) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar