Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00212
Date Filed2020-01-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning the cost of trips related to John Dunham's review of the origins of the government's investigation of Russian interference in the 2016 election. CREW also asked for expedited processing for its second and third requests. DOJ acknowledged receipt of the requests and denied CREW's requests for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its three requests, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-271COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6769247) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Dep't of Justice, # 4 Summons Attorney General)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-28Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-02-044STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 02/04/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/3/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/3/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/3/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/4/2020.) (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar