Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00221
Date Filed2020-01-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning the Tusayan Stilo development near the Grand Canyon. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told CBD that its request was placed on the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-271COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6770370) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of the Interior)(Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-28Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-283SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-284CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY . (Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-02-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General February 4, 2020. (Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar