Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBRAGG v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00214
Date Filed2020-01-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffSAMANTHA ELIZABETH BRAGG
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-27Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 1/27/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-271COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by SAMANTHA ELIZABETH BRAGG. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (zmd) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-272MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SAMANTHA ELIZABETH BRAGG. (zmd) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-03-053FIAT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 03/05/2020. (zmc) Modified on 3/13/2020 (zmc). (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-11Case assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmc) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-114NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SAMANTHA ELIZABETH BRAGG. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-213. (zmc) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-115SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmc) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/12/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/12/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/11/2020.) (jf) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-237STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 03/23/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-308NOTICE of Appearance by Sian Jones on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar