Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleShafiq v. Department of Justice
DistrictEastern District of Michigan
CityDetroit
Case Number2:2020cv10213
Date Filed2020-01-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Denise Page Hood
PlaintiffHatim Shafiq
Case DescriptionHatim Shafiq submitted a FOIA request to the FBI and the Criminal Division at the Department of Justice. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from either agency, Shafiq filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-281COMPLAINT filed by Hatim Shafiq against U.S. Department of Justice. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7577244 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Legghio, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-282SUMMONS Issued for *U.S. Department of Justice * (LHos) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-283SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (LHos) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-02-104CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Department of Justice served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Record) (Legghio, Brian) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-105CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Record) (Legghio, Brian) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-106CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Record) (Legghio, Brian) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar