Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00239
Date Filed2020-01-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas F. Hogan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning communications that included State Department Resident Legal Advisor in Ukraine Jeff Cole and U.S. Embassy Kyiv employee Svitlana Pardus and also included National Security Council staffer Eric Ciaramella. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-291COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6778130) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-29Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-01-292SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)
2020-02-063NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/7/2020. (Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/8/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/4/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/4/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) Modified date of service on 2/10/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-02-075ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/4/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/5/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/7/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul); Modified on 2/10/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-02-10NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, was entered in error. Said pleading is a duplicate of Docket Entry 4 . (ztth) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar