Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHARPER v. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00252
Date Filed2020-01-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffDAVID HARPER
Case DescriptionDavid Harper submitted two FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management for records. His first FOIA request asked for records concerning disciplinary actions related to him from June 2017 to the present. His second FOIA request was sent to the BLM Idaho Field Office asking for records related to a decision in his administrative grievance. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. In response to his request to the BLM Idaho Field Office, the agency located 121 pages, which were transferred to the Office of the Inspector General for review. OIG denied records under Exemption 5 (privileges). After hearing nothing further from the agency, Harper filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-301COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6782638) filed by DAVID HARPER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Naylor, Lauren) (Entered: 01/30/2020)
2020-01-31Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-312SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-02-203RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/06/2020. (Naylor, Lauren) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-204RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR served on 2/6/2020 (Naylor, Lauren) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-205ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 2/6/2020. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 2/27/2020. (Naylor, Lauren) Modified on 2/21/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-21NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General; emailed to lauren@wilkenfeldlaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. Incorrect selection made. When filing select, Summons Returned Executed as to the U.S. Attorney. (ztd, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar